FL S0426 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Condominium and Homeowners' Association Economic Crime, Fraud, and Corruption Investigation Pilot Program within the Department of Legal Affairs in the Office of the Attorney General; defining the term "corruption"; requiring that the pilot program be funded from the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes Trust Fund; requiring that the pilot program's primary office be located in Miami-Dade County, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Associations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08SenateDied in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2024-02-07SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2024-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2024-02-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-02-05SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2024-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2023-11-28SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
2023-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1021 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
160151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718509Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback