FL S0420 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that private passenger motor vehicle policies may exclude certain coverages for claims resulting from the operation of motor vehicles by identified individuals under certain circumstances; requiring excluded drivers to meet certain requirements for financial responsibility, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance Coverage Exclusions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#329 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-27HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-27SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
2021-04-27HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-26HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-26HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-23House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-23HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/26/2021)
2021-04-23HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-21HouseIn Messages
2021-04-21SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) adopted (472820)
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
2021-04-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-16SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2021-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-11SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2021-03-10SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-09SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2021-03-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/09/21, 11:45 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-03SenateNow in Judiciary
2021-03-03SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-15SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2021-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H273 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/SB 420, 1st Eng.
S54 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Message sent to senate
H719 (Similar To) 2021-04-23 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 54

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627747Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Amendment/478706/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Amendment/596252/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Amendment/472820/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Analyses/2021s00420.pre.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Analyses/2021s00420.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Analyses/2021s00420.pre.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Analyses/2021s00420.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Analyses/2021s00420.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Analyses/2021s00420.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Vote/SenateVote_s00420c1035.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Vote/HouseVote_s00420e1329.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Vote/2021-03-03%200930AM~S00420%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Vote/2021-03-09%201145AM~S00420%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/420/Vote/2021-04-16%200900AM~S00420%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback