FL S0418 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-217, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1185 (Ch. 2023-130)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying a qualification for a local governmental entity's representative on a self-insurer's governing body; revising membership requirements for specified members of the Florida Commission on Hurricane Loss Projection Methodology; authorizing insurers to file with the Office of Insurance Regulation personal lines residential property insurance rating plans providing rate differentials based on certain windstorm mitigation construction standards; revising the timeframe for advance notices from insurers to insureds of automatic bank withdrawal increases, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#476 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#370 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-16 Chapter No. 2023-217, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1185 (Ch. 2023-130)
2023-06-12 Approved by Governor
2023-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-05-04SenateOrdered enrolled
2023-05-04HouseCS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
2023-05-04HouseAmendment 394669 Recede
2023-05-04HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2023-05-03HouseIn Messages
2023-05-03SenateRequested House to recede
2023-05-03SenateRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (394669)
2023-05-02SenateIn returning messages
2023-05-02HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
2023-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-01HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-05-01HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2023-05-01HouseAmendment 394669 adopted
2023-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-28House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2023-04-28HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
2023-04-28HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-04-19HouseIn Messages
2023-04-19SenateImmediately certified
2023-04-19SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2023-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2023-04-19SenateAmendment(s) adopted (174606)
2023-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-04-12SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2023-04-12SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-04-11SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2023-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-03-08SenateCS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
2023-03-08SenateNow in Rules
2023-03-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-03-07SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2023-03-07SenateCS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-03-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2023-02-23SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2023-02-23SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-02-21SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2023-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/21/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
2023-01-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H505 (Same As) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 418 (Ch. 2023-217)
H1185 (Similar To) 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-130; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 418 (Ch. 2023-217)
S1398 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1185 (Ch. 2023-130), CS/CS/CS/SB 418 (Ch. 2023-217)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32754Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6244621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270629Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270665Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277276Amended CodeSee Bill Text
634041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Amendment/570080/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Amendment/881130/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Amendment/174606/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Analyses/2023s00418.pre.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Analyses/2023s00418.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Analyses/2023s00418.pre.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Analyses/2023s00418.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Analyses/2023s00418.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Analyses/2023s00418.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Analyses/2023s00418.hms.bi.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Vote/2023-02-21%200330PM~S00418%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Vote/2023-03-07%200200PM~S00418%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Vote/2023-04-11%200830AM~S00418%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Vote/SenateVote_s00418c3017.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Vote/HouseVote_s00418e1370.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/418/Vote/HouseVote_s00418e1476.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback