FL S0414 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that participation in the Senior Management Service Class of the Florida Retirement System is compulsory for each district's assistant regional counsel supervisors, beginning on a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsel Membership in the Senior Management Service Class

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2023-03-22SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2023-03-22SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-03-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2023-01-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H375 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
121055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback