FL S0412 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1135
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exception to a design requirement for dealer license plates and for fleet license plates; allowing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to authorize dealer and fleet specialty license plates; providing additional procedures and requirements for discontinuing issuance of a specialty license plate; providing for a special license plate to be issued to a recipient of the Bronze Star, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Plates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 1135
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted HB 1135
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2020-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-06SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations; Rules
2019-10-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S414 (Related) 2020-03-12 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 387
H27 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S108 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H385 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S568 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S860 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S1454 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S1500 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H387 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
H695 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H873 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
S956 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320089Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback