FL S0408 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting the requirement that a governmental entity that provides a designated area for skateboarding, inline skating, or freestyle bicycling obtain the written consent of the parent or legal guardian of a child under a certain age before allowing the child to participate in these activities in such area; requiring the governmental entity to post a rule indicating that consent forms are required for children under a certain age before participation in paintball or mountain and off-road bicycling, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designated Areas for Skateboarding, Inline Skating, Paintball, or Freestyle or Mountain and Off-roading Bicycling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#200 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-48
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HousePassed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 365
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-14HouseIn Messages
2015-04-08SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-02SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-19SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/19/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-04SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-04SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2015-02-18SenateNow in Community Affairs
2015-02-17SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/17/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2015-01-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0365 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 408 (Ch. 2015-48)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3160085Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback