FL S0406 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a public records exemption for information that could identify a minor which is contained in a record held by the court relating to the minor's petition to waive consent requirements to obtain an abortion; providing for future legislative review and repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Minor's Petition to Waive Consent/Abortion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseReceived
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-02-12HouseIn Messages
2020-02-06SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2020-02-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20
2020-01-27SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2020-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-01-24SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-22SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 7
2020-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-13SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-12-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-09-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S404 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received
H267 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
H265 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39001118Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback