FL S0406 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a public records exemption for information that could identify a minor which is contained in a record held by the court relating to the minor's petition to waive consent requirements to obtain an abortion; providing for future legislative review and repeal under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Minor's Petition to Waive Consent/Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-13SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-12-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-09-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S404 (Related) 2019-12-13 - Now in Judiciary
H267 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Placed on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39001118Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback