FL S0404 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Reclassifying the criminal offense for a specified violation; prohibiting physicians from performing or inducing the termination of the pregnancy of a minor unless specified requirements are satisfied; requiring a physician to obtain written consent from a minor's parent or legal guardian before performing or inducing a termination of the pregnancy of a minor; providing exceptions to such consent requirement; providing criminal penalties for physicians, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseReceived
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-02-12HouseIn Messages
2020-02-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
2020-02-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-01-29SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-01-29SenateAmendment(s) adopted (115836, 694892) 213
2020-01-29SenateAmendment(s) failed (197648, 207366, 237978, 343056, 363704, 380726, 386300, 393252, 404156, 407778, 454474, 456390, 458018, 458694, 467392, 532410, 581924, 754024, 771568, 880790, 909932, 927186, 938934, 969342) 207, 210, 211, 212, 213
2020-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20
2020-01-27SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2020-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-01-24SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-22SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 7
2020-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-15SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-15SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2020-01-14SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/15/20, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-12-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-09-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S406 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received
H265 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
H267 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
743065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/BillText/e1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/771420/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/182132/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/395188/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/302010/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/894624/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/146866/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/416354/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/139926/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/745328/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/615276/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/527270/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/941164/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/718240/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/884430/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/788438/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/322074/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Vote/SenateVote_s00404e1002.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback