FL S0404 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 8:30 am in 110 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Parental Consent for Abortion Act"; prohibiting a physician from performing an abortion on a minor unless the physician has been presented with consent from the minor's parent or guardian, as appropriate; providing an exception for a medical emergency; authorizing a minor to petition any circuit court in which the minor resides for a waiver of consent required to obtain an abortion, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental Consent for Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-15SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-15SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2020-01-14SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/15/20, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-12-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/10/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2019-09-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S406 (Related) 2020-01-17 - On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
H265 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39001117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/771420/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/182132/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/395188/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/302010/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/894624/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/146866/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/416354/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/139926/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/745328/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/615276/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/527270/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/941164/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/718240/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/884430/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/788438/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/404/Amendment/322074/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback