FL S0400 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring district school boards to inform students and parents of certain acceleration, academic, and career planning options; requiring certain information to be included in such notification; requiring a personalized academic and career plan be developed in consultation with a certified school counselor for certain students, etc.
Title
Guidance Services for Academic and Career Planning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H229 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |