FL S0400 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a state attorney, or his or her designee, to initiate an elder abuse fatality review team in his or her judicial circuit; authorizing elder abuse fatality review teams in existence on a certain date to continue to exist; requiring each review team to annually submit to the department a summary report containing specified information by a certain date; providing immunity from monetary liability for review team members under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elder Abuse Fatality Review Teams

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#669 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10 Chapter No. 2020-17
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (641173)
2020-03-10SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-10HousePassed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-09HouseAmendment(s) adopted (641173) 994
2020-03-09HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-06HouseReceived
2020-03-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-02-04HouseIn Messages
2020-02-04SenateImmediately certified
2020-02-04SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1
2020-02-04SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-01-29SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20
2020-01-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-01-23SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/23/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-12-10SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-11-05SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-11-05SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-10-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations
2019-09-30SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H253 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 400 passed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4151103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback