FL S0398 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - CS adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the relationship between and shared interests of the people of Taiwan and the United States and supporting these interests, as well as future opportunities for international trade between the two nations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taiwan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateCS adopted
2018-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-20SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/18
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-16SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-15SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-10-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H8013 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Adopted by Publication

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback