FL S0382 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing honorary designations of certain transportation facilities in specified counties; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers; providing for "The Hope and Healing Highway" designation, notwithstanding a specified provision, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#902 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#791 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09 Chapter No. 2018-161
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 100 NAYS 1
2018-03-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s) (420538)
2018-03-09HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) as amended
2018-03-09SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (420538) 1012
2018-03-05SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (187041)
2018-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 171
2018-03-04HouseReceived
2018-03-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-03HouseIn Messages
2018-03-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateOrdered engrossed
2018-03-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (299246, 470640, 722874, 939000, 957578) 553
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-20SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-15SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-11-14SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-10-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H205 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H171 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
H849 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1186 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1734 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H109 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H127 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1163 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
S330 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S358 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1066 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/863526/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/299246/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/538164/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/957578/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/470640/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/960212/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/835006/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/939000/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Amendment/722874/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Vote/SenateVote_s00382e1008.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Vote/HouseVote_s00382e1791.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Vote/SenateVote_s00382e1012.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/382/Vote/HouseVote_s00382e1902.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback