FL S0378 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a county, municipality, or other local governmental entity from adopting or maintaining in effect an ordinance or a rule which has the effect of prohibiting a driver from, or authorizing the issuance of a citation to a driver for, back-in parking a motor vehicle in a parking space located in a parking garage; providing that any such ordinance or rule in effect on a specified date is void, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parking Garages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-25SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Rules
2017-10-02SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12501075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1660441Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback