FL S0376 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that certain funds distributed into the Land Acquisition Trust Fund be used for conservation and management projects in certain counties; providing the types of projects for which the Department of Environmental Protection may use such funds; authorizing the department to distribute such funds to the appropriate agency, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-07SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-01-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H555 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback