FL S0374 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Agricultural Equipment Fair Repair Act"; requiring original equipment manufacturers of agricultural equipment to provide certain manufacturing, diagnostic, and repair information to independent repair providers and owners; prohibiting the original equipment manufacturers from excluding certain information concerning security-related functions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Repair of Agricultural Equipment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-16SenateNow in Rules
2021-02-15SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 1
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/15/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-01-27SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2021-01-27SenateFavorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/27/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Agriculture; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2020-12-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H511 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
68635Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback