FL S0374 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Now in Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the membership of the Children and Youth Cabinet within the Executive Office of the Governor to include a representative from the Florida Dental Association appointed by the Governor, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children and Youth Cabinet

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateNow in Health Policy
2019-02-11SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/11/19, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Rules
2019-01-17SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40256Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback