FL S0372 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Redefining terms to authorize the production, processing, transportation, sale, possession, and administration of marijuana in a form for smoking for medical use; deleting a provision requiring specified parties to be able to access the medical marijuana use registry to verify the authorization of a qualified patient or a caregiver to possess a marijuana delivery device; deleting provisions prohibiting a medical marijuana treatment center from contracting for certain services related to marijuana delivery devices, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smoking Marijuana for Medical Use

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-01-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S182 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
H7015 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/21/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback