FL S0370 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a specified annual appropriation to the Florida Forever Trust Fund; prohibiting moneys from the Land Acquisition Trust Fund from being used for specified costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01HouseIn Messages
2018-01-31SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateRead 3rd time
2018-01-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-17SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-01-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-16SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-11SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/11/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-12-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 12/07/17, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
2017-11-06SenateFavorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 11/06/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-10-16SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-09-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1353 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
H7063 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback