FL S0368 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming the Tampa Bay Area Regional Transit Authority Metropolitan Planning Organization Chairs Coordinating Committee as the Chairs Coordinating Committee; providing that a mayor's designated alternate may be a member of the governing board of the authority; revising a provision requiring the authority to present the regional transit development plan and updates to specified entities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tampa Bay Area Regional Transit Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2020-03-06HouseReceived
2020-03-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-06HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-05HouseIn Messages
2020-03-05SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-04SenateAmendment(s) adopted (303096)
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
2020-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-26SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-11SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-10SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Community Affairs
2020-01-29SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-09-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H503 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
343922Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback