FL S0368 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an appropriation for certain projects related to the Indian River Lagoon Comprehensive Conservation and Management Plan; authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to make grants for such projects, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-01-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H141 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
S216 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback