FL S0368 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Statewide Procurement Efficiency Task Force within the department; specifying the purpose and membership of the task force; providing that task force members shall serve without compensation or reimbursement of expenses, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Management Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 12/07/17, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/07/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-16SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2017-09-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H111 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback