FL S0360 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting specified changes to certain insurance policy prescription drug formularies, except under certain circumstances; requiring small employer carriers to limit specified changes to prescription drug formularies under certain health benefit plans; prohibiting certain health maintenance organizations from making specified changes to health maintenance contract prescription drug formularies, except under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Consumer Protection from Nonmedical Changes to Prescription Drug Formularies
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] | Sen. Victor Torres [D] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H229 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 42393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/360 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/360/BillText/Filed/HTML |