FL S0358 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1521
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1521
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Professional Counselors Licensure Compact; providing for recognition of the privilege to practice licensed professional counseling in member states; providing for the recognition of the practice of professional counseling through telehealth in member states; providing for the development of the data system, reporting procedures, and the exchange of specified information between member states; specifying that the compact, commission rules, and commission actions are binding on member states, etc.
Title
Mental Health Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1521 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1521 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/22/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-11-03 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/03/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S590 (Related) 2022-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1523
H1521 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-63
H1523 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-64
H1521 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-63
H1523 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-64
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |