FL S0358 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing honorary designation of a certain transportation facility in specified counties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations/Senator Greg Evers Memorial Highway

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HouseIn Messages
2018-03-09SenatePassed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-24SenateNow in Rules
2017-10-24SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-16SenateReferred to Transportation; Rules
2017-09-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H171 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback