FL S0354 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes a limitation on the amount of time that a gift accepted on behalf of a governmental entity or charitable organization may be retained.
Title
Gifts/Governmental Entity/Charitable Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 35 | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; Rules; Judiciary -SJ 35 | |
2011-01-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/354 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0354/BillText/Filed/HTML |