FL S0348 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "coastal community"; authorizing certain municipalities to establish pilot programs to regulate or ban disposable plastic bags; directing participating municipalities to collect data and submit reports to the municipal governing bodies and the Department of Environmental Protection, etc.
Title
Disposable Plastic Bags
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 70325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/348 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/348/BillText/Filed/HTML |