FL S0340 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the creation of an individualized seizure action plan for a student with epilepsy or seizure disorders to receive health care at school; requiring school nurses or appropriate school employees to coordinate the care of such students and ensure that specified training is provided to specified school employees and individuals; requiring school districts to provide specified information and training to school bus drivers who transport students with epilepsy or seizure disorders; providing immunity from liability under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Care of Students with Epilepsy or Seizure Disorders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 173 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 173 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/18/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H173 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-19