FL S0340 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Medicaid statewide prepaid dental program; directing the Agency for Health Care Administration to contract with prepaid dental health plans meeting specified criteria; directing the agency to apply for and implement state plan amendments or waivers of applicable federal laws and regulations necessary to implement the statewide prepaid dental program; directing the agency to issue a competitive procurement to licensed prepaid dental health plans to implement the program; providing that enrollment in the statewide prepaid dental program shall not begin until the necessary state plan amendments or waivers of applicable federal laws and regulations are obtained and implemented, etc.
Title
Statewide Prepaid Dental Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/19/14, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2013-12-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/08/14, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-11-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0027 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 91205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |