FL S0338 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the energy consumption information each state agency is required to provide to the Department of Management Services to include transportation fleet energy consumption information; requiring the state energy management plan to include recommendations for state agencies to improve energy efficiency by transitioning, retrofitting, or replacing certain inefficient facilities and fleets, etc.
Title
Energy Efficiency Savings in State Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/338 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/338/BillText/Filed/HTML |