FL S0338 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Corrections to extend the limits of confinement to allow an inmate to participate in supervised community release, subject to certain requirements, as prescribed by the department by rule; requiring the department to administer a risk assessment instrument to appropriately determine an inmate's ability to be released; authorizing a law enforcement or probation officer to arrest an inmate without a warrant under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extension of Confinement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Meeting cancelled
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-01-15SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944516Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
945092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
946503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback