FL S0328 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to create a veteran identification card for certain purposes; authorizing use of the card as proof of veteran status for expedited processing of an application for a license to carry a concealed weapon or firearm, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veteran Identification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-17SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/17/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-24SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-10-24SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-12SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-09-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H107 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3220511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
472015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4936402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501607Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
52702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
539001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback