FL S0326 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to increase the period of time during which the accrued benefit from specified limitations on homestead property tax assessments may be transferred from a prior homestead to a new homestead and to provide an effective date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Property Tax Assessments/Increased Portability Period

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S324 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H1389 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H1391 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback