FL S0326 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the Department of Children and Families establish the Florida Veterans' Care Coordination Program to provide veterans and their families with behavioral health care referral and care coordination services; requiring that the department contract with managing entities to enter into agreements with Florida 211 Network participants for such services, etc.
Title
Services for Veterans and their Families
Sponsors
Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security Committee | Sen. Dana Young [R] | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Dorothy Hukill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 12/04/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-27 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2017-11-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-11-16 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/16/17, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H179 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee