FL S0324 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the timeframe during which the accrued benefit from specified limitations on homestead property tax assessments may be transferred from a prior homestead to a new homestead; revising the timeframe during which an owner of homestead property significantly damaged or destroyed by a named tropical storm or hurricane must establish a new homestead to make a certain election, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations on Homestead Assessments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-04-04SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-14SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-12SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S326 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H1391 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H1389 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
193155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback