FL S0322 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for allocation of fees from certain driver license examinations administered by tax collectors; providing for allocation of fees from certain driver license reinstatement services performed by tax collectors, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees Charged by Tax Collectors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 185
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted HB 185
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-27SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-17SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/17/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-15SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-11-14SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-10-12SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-09-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H185 (Same As) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-129

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32221Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback