FL S0320 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an annual appropriation for certain projects related to the Indian River Lagoon Comprehensive Conservation and Management Plan; authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to make grants for such projects; requiring the department to coordinate such grants with certain water management districts, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05SenateDied in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced
2023-02-21SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2023-02-21SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2023-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/21/23, 9:30 am, 301 Senate Building
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2023-01-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H547 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback