FL S0320 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the "Clinic Protection Act"; prohibiting a person from committing certain acts against reproductive health services clients, providers, or assistants; providing civil remedies for those aggrieved by specified violations against reproductive health services clients, providers, or assistants or against certain properties; requiring a court to take actions necessary to safeguard the health, safety, or privacy of specified persons under certain circumstances, including granting restraining orders that may prohibit or restrict the photographing of such persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Clinics

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-12SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules
2017-09-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H189 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76206Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback