FL S0316 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the court to revoke, for a period not less than 1 year nor exceeding 5 years, the driver's license of an operator of a motor vehicle adjudicated delinquent for fleeing or attempting to elude a law enforcement officer under specified circumstances. Prohibits the court from suspending, deferring, or withholding an adjudication of delinquency for a juvenile who fled or attempted to elude a law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Fleeing Law Enforcement Officer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 32
2011-01-05 Referred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Transportation; Budget -SJ 32
2010-12-22 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161935Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback