FL S0312 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending and repealing provisions to conform to the directive of the Legislature in section 9 of chapter 2012-116, Laws of Florida, codified as section 11.242(5)(j), Florida Statutes, to prepare a reviser's bill to omit all statutes and laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#96 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HousePassed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-13HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-13HouseSubstituted for HB 7031
2021-04-08House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021)
2021-04-08HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-25HouseIn Messages
2021-03-18SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2021-03-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-11SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/21
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-18SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-02-18SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Rules
2021-02-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7031 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 312

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
335066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33981Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380276Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback