FL S0312 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Hearing: Dec 10 @ 2:00 pm in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting motor vehicle repair shops or their employees from offering anything of value to a customer in exchange for making an insurance claim for motor vehicle glass replacement or repair, including offers made through certain persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance Coverage for Windshield Glass

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 11/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2019-09-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H169 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559920Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback