FL S0310 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter No. 2019-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter No. 2019-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the terms "ATV" and "ROV" to increase the authorized width and dry weight of such vehicles; redefining the term "all-terrain vehicle" to increase the authorized width and dry weight of the vehicle, etc.
Title
Off-highway Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#143 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Chapter No. 2019-19 | |
2019-05-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Substituted for HB 659 |
2019-04-11 | House | Received |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-04 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/21/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H659 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 310 (Ch. 2019-19)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
261 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 21265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
317 | 0003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |