FL S0310 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 922 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 922 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to issue Silver Star, Distinguished Service Cross, Navy Cross, and Air Force Cross license plates, without payment of the license tax, to persons meeting specified criteria, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle License Plates
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Evers [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 922 (Ch. | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 31 | |
2011-10-04 | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Transportation; Budget -SJ 31 | |
2011-09-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/310 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0310/BillText/Filed/HTML |