FL S0308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing, at the request of an eligible plan, a licensed basic or advanced life support ambulance service to provide nonemergency medical transportation in permitted ambulances in any county, notwithstanding any ordinance relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity or a specified provision relating to licensure, etc.
Title
Nonemergency Medical Transportation Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/308 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/308/BillText/Filed/HTML |