FL S0308 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Rule of Law Adherence Act"; creating provisions relating to federal immigration enforcement; prohibiting sanctuary policies; requiring state entities, local governmental entities, and law enforcement agencies to comply with and support the enforcement of federal immigration law; authorizing a board of county commissioners to adopt an ordinance to recover costs for complying with an immigration detainer; authorizing local governmental entities and law enforcement agencies to petition the Federal Government for reimbursement of certain costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Immigration Enforcement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2017-09-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H9 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
908101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
908402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback