FL S0302 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing Medicaid nonemergency transportation services to be provided to a Medicaid recipient by certain transportation network companies or transportation brokers, subject to compliance with certain requirements; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to update certain regulations, policies, or other guidance by a specified date; authorizing a licensed basic life support or licensed advanced life support ambulance service to provide nonemergency Medicaid transportation in permitted ambulances in any county at the request of a certain eligible plan, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonemergency Medical Transportation Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-19SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/19/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-01-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H411 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31687Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback