FL S0300 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the length of time by which receipt of the complaint must be acknowledged and copies thereof provided to named parties; revising the length of time by which a complainant may file a complaint with the Public Employees Relations Commission following termination of the Florida Commission on Human Relations' investigation; requiring the commission to provide notice to an aggrieved person under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Commission on Human Relations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-14SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-30SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
2017-09-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H307 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11231895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
760065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76060Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback