FL S0296 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to limitations on the size of individual wine containers; repealing provisions relating to limitations on the size of individual cider containers; revising provisions authorizing a restaurant to allow a patron to remove bottles of wine from a restaurant for off-premises consumption; providing limitations on retail sales by a craft distillery to consumers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beverage Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 669
2018-03-09SenateSubstituted CS/HB 669
2018-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-30SenateCS/CS/CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-24SenateCS/CS/CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/23/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-12SenateNow in Regulated Industries
2018-01-12SenateRemaining references corrected to Regulated Industries; Rules
2018-01-11SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-01-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-09SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-12SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2017-12-08SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-07SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 12/07/17, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-09-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H669 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
564055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback