FL S0294 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of a donor or prospective donor to the direct-support organization of the Statewide Council on Human Trafficking who desires to remain anonymous; providing an exemption from notice requirements for specified meetings; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Statewide Council on Human Trafficking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-30SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2021-11-30SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/30/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-10-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2021-09-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H617 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Now in Government Operations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16618Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback